Baca et al v. Quick Bail Bond and Tax Service et al
Plaintiff: Jared Baca, Gladys Zubia-Aranda, Charlie Baca, Heidi Baca and Jordan Chance Wright
Defendant: Quick Bail Bond and Tax Service, Yeira Ivonne Sanchez, Fabian Ken Terveen Arreola, Bradley Smith and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2018cv00016
Filed: January 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Curry
Presiding Judge: Judith C. Herrera
Presiding Judge: Gregory B. Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth granting 105 Motion to Compel Responses and for Sanctions. (bni)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth quashing 95 Order to Show Cause. (ts)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Show Cause Response due by 7/8/2019. (ts)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth denying 74 Motion to Stay. (bni)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND DENYING RELATED MOTIONS AS MOOT by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth, GRANTING 33 Motion to Amend Complaint; DENYING AS MOOT 34 Motion for Leave to File Rule 56(d) Affidavit of Counsel and Conduct Limited Discovery; DENYING AS MOOT 23 Defendant Thera Jan Wells' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; DENYING AS MOOT 25 Defendant Shawn Wells' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (km)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baca et al v. Quick Bail Bond and Tax Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Baca
Represented By: Frances Crockett Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Zubia-Aranda
Represented By: Frances Crockett Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Baca
Represented By: Frances Crockett Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi Baca
Represented By: Frances Crockett Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Chance Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quick Bail Bond and Tax Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yeira Ivonne Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabian Ken Terveen Arreola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?