Salopek v. Zurich American Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Marcie Salopek
Defendant: Zurich American Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00339
Filed: April 11, 2018
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: Dona Ana
Referring Judge: Carmen E. Garza
Presiding Judge: James A. Parker
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Resetting Telephonic Status Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. The Status Conference set for 8/16/2018 is RESET for 8/23/2018 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
June 20, 2018 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (atc)
June 11, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 8/16/2018 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)
May 7, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 6/1/2018. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 6/11/2018 at 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's Meet Me line at 505.348.2693 to be connected to the proceedings.] This line can only accommodate up to five telephone lines, including the Court's; if the parties anticipate that they will exceed this capacity, they must contact the Court immediately so that alternative arrangements may be made. (atc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salopek v. Zurich American Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcie Salopek
Represented By: Randi McGinn
Represented By: Peter S. Selvin
Represented By: Matthew L Venezia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Johanna Dennehy
Represented By: John L. Jacobus
Represented By: Jon Thomas Neumann
Represented By: Daniel J O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?