Candelaria v. Molina Healthcare, Inc.

Plaintiff: Nora Candelaria
Defendant: Molina Healthcare, Inc. and Molina Healthcare of New Mexico, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00725
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Las Cruces Office
County: -OUT OF STATE-
0 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
1 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nora Candelaria. Molina Healthcare of New Mexico, Inc. served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Braziel, J.)
September 18, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nora Candelaria. Molina Healthcare, Inc. served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Braziel, J.)
September 13, 2018 Summons on Amended Complaint Issued as to All Defendants. (ln)
September 12, 2018 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. adding Molina Healthcare of New Mexico, Inc.., filed by Nora Candelaria. (Siegel, Jack)
July 27, 2018 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
July 27, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (ln)
July 27, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-5943308 re #1 Complaint filed by Nora Candelaria (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Braziel, J.)
July 27, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Molina Healthcare, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Nora Candelaria. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Braziel, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Candelaria v. Molina Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Candelaria
Represented By: J. Derek Braziel
Represented By: Travis Andrew Gasper
Represented By: Jack L. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molina Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molina Healthcare of New Mexico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?