Ward et al v. City of Hobbs et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Hargrove, Sandra Todd and Octavia Ward
Defendant: Ruben Gastelum, Troy D Brackeen, City of Hobbs and Zakariah T Dale
Case Number: 2:2018cv01025
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by January 24, 2019. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (sju) (sju)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for January 28, 2019 at 02:00 PM. Joint status report due January 21, 2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than January 22, 2019. (cbf)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand Answer to Complaint to Recover Damages for Civil Rights Violations by Troy D Brackeen, City of Hobbs, Zakariah T Dale, Ruben Gastelum. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Sandra Todd, Octavia Ward, Dennis Hargrove.(Robles, Luis)
December 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Troy D Brackeen, City of Hobbs, Zakariah T Dale, Ruben Gastelum Stipulation Regarding Deadline to File Answer (Robles, Luis)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis E. Robles on behalf of Troy D Brackeen, City of Hobbs, Zakariah T Dale, Ruben Gastelum (Robles, Luis)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Octavia Ward. Zakariah T Dale served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Kennedy, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Octavia Ward. Ruben Gastelum served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Kennedy, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Octavia Ward. Troy D Brackeen served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Kennedy, Joseph)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Octavia Ward. City of Hobbs served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Kennedy, Joseph)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
November 5, 2018 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces) (Lea County). (ln)
November 5, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ln)
November 5, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (ln)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Recover Damages for Civil Rights Violations against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Sandra Todd, Octavia Ward, Dennis Hargrove. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Joseph)
November 2, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6115763 re #1 Complaint, filed by Sandra Todd, Octavia Ward, Dennis Hargrove (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kennedy, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward et al v. City of Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Gastelum
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy D Brackeen
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hobbs
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zakariah T Dale
Represented By: Luis E. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Hargrove
Represented By: Joseph P. Kennedy
Represented By: Shannon L Kennedy
Represented By: Larissa Marie Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Todd
Represented By: Joseph P. Kennedy
Represented By: Shannon L Kennedy
Represented By: Larissa Marie Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavia Ward
Represented By: Joseph P. Kennedy
Represented By: Shannon L Kennedy
Represented By: Larissa Marie Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?