Wickham v. Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher D Wickham
Defendant: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01124
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Hughson, Charles)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Simmonds on behalf of Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC (Simmonds, Michael)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 2/1/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 1/2/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court MAIL a copy of this #5 Initial Scheduling Order to Plaintiff Christopher D. Wickham.(gbg)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. (Hughson, Charles)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC re 2 Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment (Text Only),,, (Hughson, Charles)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
December 3, 2018 Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (mnb)
December 3, 2018 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (mnb)
December 3, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6162829 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Hughson, Charles)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC from County of Otero - Alamogordo Magistrate Court, case number M-38-CV-2018-00413. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hughson, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wickham v. Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher D Wickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC
Represented By: Charles R Hughson
Represented By: Michael R Simmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?