Romero et al v. County of Lincoln et al

Plaintiff: George Romero and Roger Romero
Defendant: County of Lincoln, The Board of Commissioners of the County of Lincoln, State of New Mexico and The Board of County Commissioners
Case Number: 2:2018cv01137
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: New Mexico District Court
0 Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
1 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Joint Status Report due by 3/27/2019. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2019 at 02:30 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use Code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 2/8/2019. (mm)
January 17, 2019 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by County of Lincoln, The Board of County Commissioners. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Roger Romero, George Romero.(Drebing, Mark)
January 4, 2019 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Romero, George Romero. County of Lincoln served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (Mitchell, Gary) Modified text on 1/7/2019 (vh).
January 4, 2019 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Romero, George Romero. The Board of County Commissioners served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (Mitchell, Gary)
January 4, 2019 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roger Romero, George Romero. County Clerk of the County of Lincoln served on 12/27/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. (Mitchell, Gary) Modified text on 1/7/2019 (vh).
December 13, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary J Cook on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cook, Zachary)
December 13, 2018 Summons Issued as to County of Lincoln, The Board of County Commissioners. (mnb)
December 6, 2018 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
December 6, 2018 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg)
December 6, 2018 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
December 5, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6167531 re #1 Complaint, filed by Roger Romero, George Romero (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Mitchell, Gary)
December 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil, Constitutional and Statutory Rights against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Roger Romero, George Romero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero et al v. County of Lincoln et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Lincoln
Represented By: Mark L. Drebing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Commissioners of the County of Lincoln, State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Mark L. Drebing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Romero
Represented By: Gary Mitchell
Represented By: Zachary J Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Romero
Represented By: Gary Mitchell
Represented By: Zachary J Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?