Fawley v. Jablonski et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Fawley and Benjamin W Fawley
Defendant: Harold Clarke, R. C. Smith, State of New Mexico, David Jablonski and Susana Martinez
Case Number: 2:2018cv01139
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE re Motion of Removal filed by Benjamin W Fawley. (meq)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Fact: Two Punishments for the Exact Same Criminal Offense by Benjamin W Fawley (meq)
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION Seeking Explanation by Benjamin W Fawley. (meq)
January 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Memorandum of Law Regarding Due Process by Benjamin W Fawley (meq)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Facts by Benjamin W Fawley (meq)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assertion of the Violation of Double Jeopardy by Benjamin W Fawley (meq)
January 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Affirmation of Enticement by Benjamin W Fawley (meq)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 Second NOTICE of Related Litigation by Benjamin W Fawley (meq)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay by Benjamin W Fawley. (meq)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for extraordinary writ by Benjamin W Fawley (vv)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #3 Petition by Benjamin W Fawley (vv)
December 31, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM of law re #3 Petition filed by Benjamin W Fawley. (vv)
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Order by Benjamin W Fawley. (vv)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Litigation by Benjamin W Fawley (meq)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL REVIEW by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kc)
December 6, 2018 Chief District Judge William P. Johnson and Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (mnb)
December 6, 2018 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (mnb)
December 6, 2018 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6168745 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by R. C. Smith (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jahner, Michael)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by R. C. Smith from Fifth Judicial District Court, case number D-506-CV-2017-00989. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by R. C. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jahner, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fawley v. Jablonski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. C. Smith
Represented By: Michael S. Jahner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jablonski
Represented By: Kevin L. Nault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susana Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Fawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin W Fawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?