Fawley v. Lea County Board of Commissioners, et al.
Plaintiff: Benjamin W Fawley
Defendant: Danielle Romero, Sandy Bodle, Lea County Board of Commissioners and John/Jane Doe
Case Number: 2:2018cv01221
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Exhaustion of State remedies by Benjamin W Fawley. (gr)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM of Law by Benjamin W Fawley. (gr)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM of Law by Benjamin W Fawley. (gr)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by Benjamin W Fawley. (gr)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Benjamin W Fawley. (gr)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number ALB042467 (kg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO SE PRISONER CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (cbf)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Cure Deficiency by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (cbf)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Letter by Benjamin Fawley. Plaintiff mentions filing fee of $450.00 enclosed. Filing fee returned due to incorrect amount. (ln)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Benjamin W Fawley. (ln)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fawley v. Lea County Board of Commissioners, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin W Fawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Bodle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lea County Board of Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?