Anderson v. Hilburn
Plaintiff: Ms. Jeani Anderson and Jeani Anderson
Defendant: Patricia Hilburn and Patricia Ann Hilburn
Case Number: 2:2019cv00005
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than March 6, 2019. (jcm)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to the Complaint by Patricia Ann Hilburn. (Hibner, Paul)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Darby Hibner on behalf of Patricia Ann Hilburn (Hibner, Paul)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeani Anderson. Patricia Ann Hilburn served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Wheeler, John)
January 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Patricia Ann Hilburn. (ln)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
January 4, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (ln)
January 4, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6209060 re #1 Complaint filed by Jeani Anderson (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wheeler, John)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Avoid Fraudulent Transfers against Patricia Hilburn ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Jeani Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wheeler, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Hilburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Hilburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Ann Hilburn
Represented By: Paul Darby Hibner
Represented By: Ben Stearman Furth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Jeani Anderson
Represented By: John D. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeani Anderson
Represented By: John D. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?