Gordon v. DH Pace Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Gordon
Defendant: Wal Mart, Inc. and DH Pace Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00031
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by District Judge James O. Browning. Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 4/2/2019 at 01:30 PM in Albuquerque - 460 Vermejo Courtroom before District Judge James O. Browning. (vv)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 7. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt VACATING Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. The telephonic Rule 16(c) Conference set for April 8, 2019, is hereby VACATED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mm)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Conference set for 4/8/2019 at 02:30 PM. The parties shall call Judge Fouratt's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use Code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 4/3/2019. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/5/2019. (mm)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by DH Pace Company, Inc. Notice of Filing of State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Stiff, John)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DH Pace Company, Inc. Amended (Stiff, John)
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DH Pace Company, Inc. (Stiff, John)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant DH Pace Company, Inc's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by DH Pace Company, Inc.. (Stiff, John)
January 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Stiff on behalf of DH Pace Company, Inc. (Stiff, John)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
January 15, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg)
January 14, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
January 14, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6225768 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by DH Pace Company, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stiff, John)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DH Pace Company, Inc. from First Judicial District Court, case number D-101-CV-2018-03260. ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by DH Pace Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Stiff, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. DH Pace Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gordon
Represented By: David M Houliston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Martinez
Represented By: Megan Muirhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DH Pace Company, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Stiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?