Daniels v. Gallegos
Petitioner: Samuel Daniels
Respondent: Mark Gallegos
Case Number: 2:2019cv00176
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Judith C Herrera
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Samuel Daniels. (mjr)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff must cure deficiencies no later than May 6, 2019. (jcm)
March 5, 2019 United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
March 5, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Samuel Daniels. (gr)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Gallegos, filed by Samuel Daniels. (gr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Samuel Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?