Little v. Allstate Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Sherron Little
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00410
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: William P Johnson
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution: Anthony R Rascon substituted for Alexander Ching (Rascon, Anthony)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth G. Perkins on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Perkins, Elizabeth)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference will now be held on 7/2/2019 at 03:30 PM. (bni)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Allstate Insurance Company Non-Availability June 24, 2019 through July 16, 2019 (Simone, Stephen) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (meq).
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Simone, Stephen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Status Report by Allstate Insurance Company (Simone, Stephen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Allstate Insurance Company Filing of State Court Record (Simone, Stephen)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff by Allstate Insurance Company (Simone, Stephen)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant Allstate's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Bad Faith Insurance Practice/Breach of Contract as to the Contractual Claims by Allstate Insurance Company. (Keith, Ann)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Louise Keith on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company (Keith, Ann)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to be connected to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 5/29/2019. (ts)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 6, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)
May 3, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
May 3, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6415265 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Allstate Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Simone, Stephen)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company (Simone, Stephen)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Insurance Company. (Simone, Stephen)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from Fifth Judicial District, Lea County, case number D-506-CV-2019-00649. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Simone, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen Simone
Represented By: Jessica Singer
Represented By: Elizabeth G. Perkins
Represented By: Ann Louise Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherron Little
Represented By: Anthony R Rascon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?