The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Greenhagen et al
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Lacey Greenhagen, Sarah Greenhagen, Shannon Devine and Shelly Greenhagen
Case Number: 2:2019cv00542
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Defendants', First CROSSCLAIM against Shelly Greenhagen, The Prudential Insurance Company of America by Shannon Devine, Lacey Greenhagen, Sarah Greenhagen. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Dotson, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Dotson on behalf of Shannon Devine, Lacey Greenhagen, Sarah Greenhagen (Dotson, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Shannon Devine, Lacey Greenhagen, Sarah Greenhagen voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Dotson, David)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Shannon Devine served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (True, Nicole) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (vh).
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Shannon Devine served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (True, Nicole) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (vh).
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Shannon Devine served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (True, Nicole) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (vh).
June 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to Shannon Devine, Lacey Greenhagen, Sarah Greenhagen, Shelly Greenhagen. (khs)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb)
June 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (mnb)
June 12, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6480146 re #1 Complaint, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Payment made via Pay.gov)(True, Nicole)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Interpleader) against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Summons - Shelly Greenhagen, #4 Summons - Lacey Greenhagen, #5 Summons - Shannon Devine, #6 Summons - Sarah Greenhagen)(True, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Greenhagen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey Greenhagen
Represented By: David L. Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Greenhagen
Represented By: David L. Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Devine
Represented By: David L. Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Greenhagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Nicole True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?