Harris et al v. The Governing Board of Artesia General Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Harris and Angelia Steelman
Defendant: The Governing Board of Artesia General Hospital and Richard Gibson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00564
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angelia Steelman. Richard Gibson served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Mozes, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Harris. The Governing Board of Artesia General Hospital served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Mozes, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Gibson as to Richard Gibson. (Wiggins, Lorna)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Governing Board of Artesia General Hospital as to The Governing Board of Artesia General Hospital. (Wiggins, Lorna)
July 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to Richard Gibson, The Governing Board of Artesia General Hospital. (jg)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 18, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (jg)
June 18, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
June 18, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6490418 re #1 Complaint,, filed by Angelia Steelman (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Mozes, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kimberly Harris (Mozes, Michael)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FROM VIOLATIONS OF TITLE VII AND THE NEW MEXICO HUMAN RIGHTS ACT, WRONGFUL DISCHARGE, CONSTRUCTIVE DISCHARGE, ASSAULT, CONSPIRACY, BREACH OF IMPLIED CONTRACT OF EMPLOYMENT, BREACH OF THE COVENANT OF GOOD FAITH AND FAIR DEALING, VIOLATIONS OF THE FAMILY AND MEDICAL LEAVE ACT AND THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT AMENDMENTS ACT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Angelia Steelman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Verifications)(Mozes, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. The Governing Board of Artesia General Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Governing Board of Artesia General Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Harris
Represented By: Michael E. Mozes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelia Steelman
Represented By: Michael E. Mozes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?