Sanchez v. United Supermarkets, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Salvador Sanchez
Defendant: David Beaty and United Supermarkets, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00596
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Salvador Sanchez Plaintiff's Discovery Request (Mendez, Jessica)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 11/21/2019 at 9:00 AM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/14/2019 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ag)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 10/7/2019 at 2:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (ag)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Beaty, United Supermarkets, L.L.C. of Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff (Stahl, Thomas)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Discovery due by 1/9/2020. Motions due by 2/10/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/10/2020. (ag)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 8/12/2019. (ag)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Beaty, United Supermarkets, L.L.C. of their Rule 26 Disclosure Statement (Stahl, Thomas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Salvador Sanchez Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Mendez, Jessica)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by David Beaty, United Supermarkets, L.L.C. (Stahl, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by David Beaty, United Supermarkets, L.L.C. re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David Beaty, United Supermarkets, L.L.C. (Stahl, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by David Beaty, United Supermarkets, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - HRB Discrimination Complaint Form) (Stahl, Thomas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Salvador Sanchez. (Mendez, Jessica)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by David Beaty and United Supermarkets, L.L.C., 6 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Salvador Sanchez. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kls)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report due by 8/5/2019. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 8/12/2019 at 03:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 7/15/2019. (atc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), David Beaty, United Supermarkets, L.L.C. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Stahl, Thomas)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Salvador Sanchez voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Mendez, Jessica)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2) and in light of the pending dispositive motion, the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cbf)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by David Beaty, United Supermarkets, L.L.C.. (Stahl, Thomas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 28, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (jg)
June 28, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Supermarkets, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Albertsons LLC, Corporate Parent Spirit Acquisition Holdings, LLC for United Supermarkets, L.L.C.. (Stahl, Thomas)
June 28, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6511729 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by David Beaty, United Supermarkets, L.L.C. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Stahl, Thomas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Beaty, United Supermarkets, L.L.C. from Fifth Judicial District Court, case number D-503-CV-2019-00988. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by David Beaty, United Supermarkets, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fifth Judicial District Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Clarie Murphy, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Danny Ma, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Stahl, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. United Supermarkets, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Beaty
Represented By: Thomas L Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Supermarkets, L.L.C.
Represented By: Thomas L Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Sanchez
Represented By: Jessica Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?