Winslett v. My Way Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Irma Winslett
Defendant: My Way Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00602
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RESETTING HEARING by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The Hearing originally set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM is hereby reset to 9/13/2019 at 09:30 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mm)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING HEARING by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Hearing set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom. (mm)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY ENTRY OF A SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. In light of the pending motion to remand, the Court hereby finds good cause under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 to delay the entry of a scheduling order until the Presiding Judge resolves the matter. (cbf)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND MOTION TO ENTER SUA SPONTE ORDER, #11 Order to Show Cause filed by My Way Holdings, LLC. (Jones, Steven)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Show Cause Response due by 8/14/2019. (gbg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 9 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Irma Winslett, 5 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by My Way Holdings, LLC. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kls)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Irma Winslett voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Baeza, Jonathan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by August 3, 2019. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (sju)
July 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court AND MOTION TO ENTER SUA SPONTE ORDER by Irma Winslett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (Baeza, Jonathan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by My Way Holdings, LLC. (Jones, Steven)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), My Way Holdings, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Carrillo, Raul)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by My Way Holdings, LLC of Consent to Removal (Jones, Steven)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by My Way Holdings, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, Of Filing Affidavit and First Supplement to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit) (Jones, Steven)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (khs)
June 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (khs)
June 28, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6513395 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by My Way Holdings, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Jones, Steven)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by My Way Holdings, LLC from Third Judicial District Court, case number D-307-CV-2019-01569. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by My Way Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winslett v. My Way Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: My Way Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Steven E. Jones
Represented By: Raul A. Carrillo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Winslett
Represented By: Jonathan Baeza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?