Voltaire Builders LLC v. Bailey et al
Plaintiff: Voltaire Builders, LLC
Defendant: BAM! Pizza LLC, Michelle Bailey, Pecos Valley Pizza, Inc., Brian Bailey and BAM! Pizza Management Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00685
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
3 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar QUASHING #19 Order to Show Cause. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (am)
September 23, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #19 Order to Show Cause filed by Voltaire Builders, LLC. (Steimel, Walter)
September 23, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants. adding BAM! Pizza Management Inc. and BAM! Pizza Management Inc.., filed by Voltaire Builders, LLC. (Steimel, Walter)
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Voltaire Builders, LLC re #20 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Waiver of Oral Argument and Hearing (Steimel, Walter)
September 23, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Voltaire Builders, LLC. (Steimel, Walter)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff's show-cause response is due no later than September 25, 2019. (am)
August 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke W Ragsdale on behalf of Voltaire Builders, LLC (Ragsdale, Luke)
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Attorney Walter Steimel as to Practicing in the United States District Court, District of New Mexico. (am)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent notice must be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) Modified on 7/31/2019 (jg).
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth as the trial and pretrial judges. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar, Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 29, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 26, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-01029. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Motion to Transfer Venue. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Mexico. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/25/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Voltaire Builders LLC re #10 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division (Steimel, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case out of District/Division filed by Voltaire Builders LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Steimel, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Travel by Counsel filed by Voltaire Builders LLC (Steimel, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND with certificate of service against All Defendants filed by Voltaire Builders LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Steimel, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: the Court orders Plaintiff to properly amend its complaint to reflect each party's respective citizenship within 7 days from the date this order is signed. Each partys Certificate of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement must also properly reflect the citizenship of each party. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of the case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 6/24/2019) (rekc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of counsel residence in district re: 3 Order, 5 Order,,, filed by Voltaire Builders LLC (Steimel, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC ORDER: On April 30, 2019 the Court sent this Order out: "Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, plaintiff Volitare Builders, LLC, shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. " Plaintiff has not complied with this order and therefore, Plaintiff shall designate local counsel no later than May 31, 2019, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/29/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Voltaire Builders LLC. (Steimel, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, plaintiff Volitare Builders, LLC, shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 4/30/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Voltaire Builders LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9954018) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Steimel, Walter) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voltaire Builders LLC v. Bailey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAM! Pizza LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pecos Valley Pizza, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAM! Pizza Management Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voltaire Builders, LLC
Represented By: Walter Steimel
Represented By: Walter Earl Steimel, Jr.
Represented By: Luke W Ragsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?