Tyler Group Partners, LLC v. Madera et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Group Partners, LLC
Defendant: Pitchfork Cattle Company, LLC, Bert Madera and Montie Carol Madera
Case Number: 2:2019cv00777
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #10 Defendant Montie Carol Madera's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. (jcm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Montie Carol Madera by Montie Carol Madera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Atkinson, Clifford)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina S West on behalf of Montie Carol Madera (West, Christina)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Tyler Group Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(DeAyala, Emilio)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Plaintiff is granted leave until October 8, 2019, to amend #1 its Complaint to adequately allege subject-matter jurisdiction. (jcm)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Montie Carol Madera Waiver of the Service of Summons (Atkinson, Clifford)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford K. Atkinson on behalf of Montie Carol Madera (Atkinson, Clifford)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Tyler Group Partners, LLC Certificate of Good Standing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Zebas, Joseph)
September 3, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6645029 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Tyler Group Partners, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(DeAyala, Emilio)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Tyler Group Partners, LLC by Emilio DeAyala (Association Dues - Online Payment) (DeAyala, Emilio)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
August 26, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
August 26, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6631302 re #1 Complaint filed by Tyler Group Partners, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Zebas, Joseph)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Tyler Group Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zebas, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyler Group Partners, LLC v. Madera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pitchfork Cattle Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert Madera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montie Carol Madera
Represented By: Christina S West
Represented By: Veronique Richardson
Represented By: Clifford K. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Group Partners, LLC
Represented By: Joseph M Zebas
Represented By: Emilio DeAyala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?