Hart v. Gallegos
Petitioner: Myrtis Hart
Respondent: Mark Gallegos
Case Number: 2:2019cv00932
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Martha Vazquez
Referring Judge: Steven C Yarbrough
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Myrtis Hart. (gr)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable to Myrtis Hart re #5 Order to Show Cause. (mjr)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Proposed Order for Free Process by Myrtis Hart (mjr)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Mail Returned. Mail sent to Myrtis Hart. (gr)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Order to Cure Defects and Financial Forms. Mail sent to Myrtis Hart (gr)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Within 30 days from entry of this Order, Petitioner shall notify the Clerk in writing of his current address. (cm)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order. Mail sent to Myrtis Hart. (gr)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (cm)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to Cure Defects by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. Within 30 days of entry of this Order, Petitioner must either pay the full $5 filing fee or submit an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The Clerk is directed to mail to Petitioner a copy of this order and 2 copies of an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs with instructions. (cm)
October 3, 2019 United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (arp)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Myrtis Hart. (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Myrtis Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?