National American Insurance Company v. Iris Rodriguez
Plaintiff: National American Insurance Company, Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc. and Gulf International Corporation
Defendant: Iris Rodriguez, Chevy Alan Rodriguez and Lillie Rose Rodriguez
Case Number: 2:2019cv01020
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report due by 2/4/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 2/11/2020 at 3:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 1/17/2020. (ag)
December 24, 2019 Filing 7 Iris Rodrigue's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Iris Rodriguez. (Hightower, Clayton)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FILED IN ERROR: ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Related Case #4 by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (bc) Modified on 11/21/2019 (bc).
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Consolidate Cases by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by National American Insurance Company. (Walker, Alex)
November 4, 2019 Summons Issued as to Iris Rodriguez. (ln)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (aek)
November 1, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (aek)
November 1, 2019 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (aek)
November 1, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6776187 re #1 Complaint, filed by National American Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Noya, Jennifer)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National American Insurance Company (Noya, Jennifer)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Iris Rodriguez, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Chad Zack Rodriguez ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by National American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.1, #2 Exhibit A.2, #3 Exhibit A.3, #4 Exhibit A.4, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Noya, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National American Insurance Company v. Iris Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iris Rodriguez
Represented By: Charles C. Currier
Represented By: Elizabeth L Hightower
Represented By: Clayton S Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevy Alan Rodriguez
Represented By: Charles C. Currier
Represented By: Elizabeth L Hightower
Represented By: Clayton S Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillie Rose Rodriguez
Represented By: Charles C. Currier
Represented By: Elizabeth L Hightower
Represented By: Clayton S Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer A. Noya
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gulf International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?