Shelton v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Teena M. Shelton
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv01039
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: William P Johnson
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (arp)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (am)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar for recommendation of ultimate disposition. (mag)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief District Judge William P. Johnson and Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar as the trial and pretrial judges. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
November 7, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Teena M. Shelton re 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, of Certificate of Good Standing (MacDowell, Francesca)
November 7, 2019 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-6787593 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Teena M. Shelton (Payment made via Pay.gov)(MacDowell, Francesca)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Teena M. Shelton by Francesca J. MacDowell on behalf of: Edward A. Wicklund Olinsky Law Group 250 S. Clinton St., Suite 210Syracuse, NY 13202 315-701-5780 Fax 315-701-5781 twicklund@windisability.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (MacDowell, Francesca)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Teena M. Shelton. (MacDowell, Francesca)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by Teena M. Shelton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MacDowell, Francesca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelton v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teena M. Shelton
Represented By: Edward Wicklund
Represented By: Francesca J. MacDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?