Rodriquez et al v. National American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Lillie Rose Rodriquez, Chevy Alan Rodriquez, Estate of Chad Rodriquez and Iris Rodriquez
Defendant: Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc., National American Insurance Company and Gulf International Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv01040
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 FILED IN ERROR Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Counter Claim by Iris Rodriquez. (Hightower, Clayton) Modified on 12/23/2019 (bc).
December 3, 2019 Summons Issued as to Gulf International Corporation, Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc. (arp)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Related Cases re #4 Notice (Other) filed by National American Insurance Company by Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (bc)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract, Unfair Insurance Practices, Violations of the New Mexico Insurance Code, Bad Faith and Negligence by National American Insurance Company. (Walker, Alex)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by National American Insurance Company of Filing Motion to Consolidate Case No. 2:19-CV-01040 with Case No. 2:19-CV-01020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Walker, Alex)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
November 8, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (arp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National American Insurance Company (Noya, Jennifer)
November 7, 2019 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6788067 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by National American Insurance Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Noya, Jennifer)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National American Insurance Company from Fifth Judicial District Court, case number D-503-CV-2019-01672. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by National American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet)(Noya, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriquez et al v. National American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Rose Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chevy Alan Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Chad Rodriquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Rodriquez
Represented By: Charles C. Currier
Represented By: Elizabeth L Hightower
Represented By: Clayton S Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Interstate Field Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer A. Noya
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?