Anderson et al v. City of Las Cruces et al
Plaintiff: Keith Anderson and Carlos Cooper
Defendant: Vincent Shadd, Jeremiah Mcdaniel, City of Las Cruces, Las Cruces Police Department and Officer Christopher Nevarez
Case Number: 2:2019cv01149
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 18 Defendant McDaniel's ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, by Jeremiah Mcdaniel.(Martinez, Damian)
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 Defendant City of Las Cruces' ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, by City of Las Cruces.(Martinez, Damian)
January 9, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Nevarez as to Christopher Nevarez. (Martinez, Damian)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against City of Las Cruces, Jeremiah Mcdaniel, Christopher Nevarez. adding Christopher Nevarez and Christopher Nevarez. terminating Las Cruces Police Department and Vincent Shadd., filed by Keith Anderson, Carlos Cooper. (Lahann, Jeffrey)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 4 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Carlos Cooper, 12 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Las Cruces Police Department, Jeremiah Mcdaniel, Vincent Shadd, City of Las Cruces, 3 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Keith Anderson. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (cfa)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by City of Las Cruces, Las Cruces Police Department, Jeremiah Mcdaniel, Vincent Shadd to file response to the Complaint for the Recovery of Damages Caused by the Deprivation of Civil Rights (Doc. 1) (Martinez, Damian)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), City of Las Cruces, Las Cruces Police Department, Jeremiah Mcdaniel, Vincent Shadd voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Martinez, Damian)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Damian L Martinez on behalf of All Defendants (Martinez, Damian)
December 11, 2019 Summons Issued as to City of Las Cruces, Las Cruces Police Department, Jeremiah Mcdaniel, Vincent Shadd. (arp)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Filing fee received online: $ 400.00, receipt number 1084-6840014 (bap)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Carlos Cooper voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lahann, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Keith Anderson voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Lahann, Jeffrey)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
December 6, 2019 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DEPRIVATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by KEITH ANDERSON. (Lahann, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. City of Las Cruces et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Shadd
Represented By: Damian L Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah Mcdaniel
Represented By: Damian L Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Cruces
Represented By: Damian L Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Cruces Police Department
Represented By: Damian L Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Christopher Nevarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Anderson
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Lahann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Cooper
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Lahann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?