Margaret McGuinn v. J.L Gray Company, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00031
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea for Protocol for Production of Electronically Stored Information. (atc)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 51 Joint Motion for Protective Order. (atc)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Discovery due by June 3, 2022. Dispositive Motions due by August 11, 2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by October 20, 2022. (atc)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting 39 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. (atc)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for June 3, 2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by May 24, 2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than May 25, 2021. (atc)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea re 25 United States' Second Notice of Election to Decline Intervention. (atc)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea re 16 United States' Notice of Election to Decline Intervention. (atc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Margaret McGuinn v. J.L Gray Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?