Ortiz v. Howard et al
Plaintiff: Sierra Ortiz
Defendant: Patrick Howard and Las Cruces Public Schools
Case Number: 2:2020cv00190
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Vacating Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and #8 Initial Scheduling Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (ag)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Defendant Howard shall have until 6/1/20 to file his responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. (ag)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 DEFENDANT PATRICK HOWARD'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT. (arn)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Joint Status Report is due by 5/28/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 6/4/2020 at 2:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 5/4/2020. (ag)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Las Cruces Public Schools voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Evans, Bryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Las Cruces Public Schools. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Sierra Ortiz.(Evans, Bryan)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Las Cruces Public Schools of Agreed Upon Extension for Def. to File Its Response to Plain. Complaint (Evans, Bryan)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan D Evans on behalf of Las Cruces Public Schools (Evans, Bryan)
March 4, 2020 Summons Issued as to Patrick Howard, Las Cruces Public Schools. (jg)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Sierra Ortiz voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Strickland, Margaret)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 4, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-7001731 re #1 Complaint filed by Sierra Ortiz (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Strickland, Margaret)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
March 4, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages for Violations of Civil Rights and State Torts against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Sierra Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Strickland, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Howard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Ortiz
Represented By: Margaret Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Cruces Public Schools
Represented By: Barbara Evans
Represented By: Bryan D Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?