Martinez et al v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peter Lomax and Christopher Martinez
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC and Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00234
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Martinez, Peter Lomax as to Lowe's Companies, Inc.. (Moody, Christopher)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Martinez, Peter Lomax as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Moody, Christopher)
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC re 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing of Molly Senger (Malone, Cassandra)
April 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC re 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing of Karl Nelson (Malone, Cassandra)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC re Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Certificate of Good Standing of Jason Schwartz (Malone, Cassandra)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC re 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing of David A. Schnitzer (Malone, Cassandra)
April 29, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7101135 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Malone, Cassandra)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC by Cassandra R. Malone on behalf of: Molly Senger Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP 1050 Connecticut Ave NWWashington, DC 20036-5306 (202) 955-8571 Fax (202) 530-4209 msenger@gibsondunn.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Malone, Cassandra)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 29, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7101108 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Malone, Cassandra)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC by Cassandra R. Malone on behalf of: Karl Nelson Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP 2001 Ross Ave, Suite 2100Dallas, TX 75201 (214) 698-3203 Fax (214) 571-2945 knelson@gibsondunn.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Malone, Cassandra)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 29, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7101080 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Malone, Cassandra)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC by Cassandra R. Malone on behalf of: Jason Schwartz Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP 1050 Connecticut Ave NWWashington, DC 20036-5306 (202) 955-8242 Fax (202) 530-9522 jschwartz@gibsondunn.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Malone, Cassandra)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 29, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7101060 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Malone, Cassandra)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC by Cassandra R. Malone on behalf of: David A. Schnitzer Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP 1050 Connecticut Ave NWWashington, DC 20036-5306 (202) 887-3775 Fax (202) 530-9611 dschnitzer@gibsondunn.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Malone, Cassandra)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra R. Malone on behalf of Lowe's Companies, Inc., Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Malone, Cassandra)
March 13, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (arp)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 13, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (arp)
March 13, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)
March 13, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-7024727 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Peter Lomax, Christopher Martinez (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Moody, Christopher)
March 13, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number 1084-7024708 re: # 2 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Peter Lomax, Christopher Martinez (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Moody, Christopher)
March 13, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-7024684 re #1 Complaint filed by Peter Lomax, Christopher Martinez (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Moody, Christopher)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Peter Lomax, Christopher Martinez by Christopher M. Moody on behalf of: Elaina S. Bailey SOMMERS SCHWARTZ, P.C. One Towne Square, 17th FloorSouthfield, Michigan 48076 (248) 355-0300 ebailey@sommerspc.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Moody, Christopher)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiffs Peter Lomax, Christopher Martinez by Christopher M. Moody on behalf of: Kevin J. Stoops SOMMERS SCHWARTZ, P.C. One Towne Square, 17th FloorSouthfield, Michigan 48076 (248) 355-0300 kstoops@sommerspc.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Moody, Christopher)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Christopher Martinez, Peter Lomax. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moody, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Lowe's Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Lomax
Represented By: Repps D Stanford
Represented By: Elaina S. Bailey
Represented By: Christopher M. Moody
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Martinez
Represented By: Repps D Stanford
Represented By: Elaina S. Bailey
Represented By: Christopher M. Moody
Represented By: Kevin J. Stoops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Karl Nelson
Represented By: David A. Schnitzer
Represented By: Jason Schwartz
Represented By: William Spencer Reid
Represented By: Cassandra R. Malone
Represented By: Molly Senger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Karl Nelson
Represented By: David A. Schnitzer
Represented By: Jason Schwartz
Represented By: William Spencer Reid
Represented By: Cassandra R. Malone
Represented By: Molly Senger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?