Warner v. City of Roswell et al
Plaintiff: David Warner
Defendant: Jane Doe, Eric Brackeen, Dennis J Kintigh, Lou Mallion, City of Roswell, Joel Smoyer, Philip Smith, Paul Sanchez and Roswell Police Department
Case Number: 2:2020cv00321
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack GRANTING #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, DENYING AS MOOT #8 MOTION for Order, (yc)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Enlargement of Time by David Warner. (yc)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Warner. (yc)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING COMMUNICATION WITH THE COURT by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (mm)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack denying #3 Motion to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 (yc)
May 5, 2020 United States Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack assigned. (arp)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk send to Plaintiff a copy of this order and an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). (mm)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by David Warner. (ln)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (ln)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 9, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (ln)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Warner. (ln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner v. City of Roswell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Brackeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis J Kintigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Mallion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Roswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Smoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roswell Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?