Hopper Jr v. USA
Petitioner: Jessie Andrew Hopper, Jr.
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 2:2020cv00589
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Jerry H Ritter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 United States' RESPONSE re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Castellano, Randy)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy M Castellano on behalf of USA (Castellano, Randy)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (plp)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (jjs)
June 19, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (arp)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Jessie Andrew Hopper, Jr. (jjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopper Jr v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Randy M Castellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessie Andrew Hopper, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?