Hankston v. Kleindienst et al
Plaintiff: Brock Hankston
Defendant: Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc., Dalton Kleindienst and C.R. England, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00648
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Office: Las Cruces Office
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Amended Joint Status Report is due by September 17, 2020. A telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for October 7, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. MDT. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (rcf)
August 20, 2020 Filing 18 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on August 20, 2020. (rcf)
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. Certificate of Service (Defendant Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Brittain, Eric)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by C.R. England, Inc., Dalton Kleindienst Initial Disclosures (Hill, Megan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by September 8, 2020. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 Joint Status Report Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. (Brittain, Eric)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar VACATING and RESETTING the August 7, 2020 telephonic Status Conference. The August 7, 2020 telephonic Status Conference is VACATED and RESET for August 20, 2020, at 3:30 p.m. MDT. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (jcm)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for August 7, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. MDT. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (jcm)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Defendant Love's Amended Notice of Removal and Consent to Removal By All Served Co-Defendants from County of Dona Ana Third Judicial District, case number D-307-CV-2020-01046, filed by All Defendants. (Brittain, Eric) Modified on 7/24/2020 (arp).
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING Defendant Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. leave to amend #1 the Notice of Removal no later than August 24, 2020. (jcm)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Dalton Kleindienst and by C.R. England, Inc.. (Hill, Megan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by C.R. England, Inc. (Hill, Megan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), C.R. England, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Hill, Megan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C.R. England, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent C. R. England, Inc. for C.R. England, Inc.. (Hill, Megan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by C.R. England, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Consent of Removal (Hill, Megan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Day Hill on behalf of C.R. England, Inc. (Hill, Megan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. Defendnt's Notice of Removal and Consent to Removal By All Served Co-Defendants from County of Dona Ana, Third Judicial District Court, case number D-307-CV-2020-01046. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brittain, Eric)
July 2, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7194316 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Brittain, Eric)
July 2, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (dr)
July 2, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hankston v. Kleindienst et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M Brittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalton Kleindienst
Represented By: Megan Day Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Day Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock Hankston
Represented By: Kiernan McAlpine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?