Molina v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: AURORA MOLINA
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2020cv00670
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 10/6/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 10/13/2010 at 2:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/14/2020. (ke)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed within 10 days. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants Rule 12(B)(6) Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Alex)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Rule 12(B)(6) Motion for Partial Dismissal by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Alex)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Walker, Alex)
July 27, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7227394 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Holm, Timothy)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson by Timothy C Holm on behalf of: Anita Modak-Truran Butler Snow LLP 150 3rd Avenue South, Suite 1600Nashville, Tennessee 37201 615-651-6700 Fax 615-651-6701 Anita.Modak-Truran@butlersnow.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Holm, Timothy)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson D.N.M.LR-Civ. 83.3 Certification (Holm, Timothy)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Holm, Timothy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summonses, CCS & Consent served on Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, Inc. on 07/13/2020, filed by Aurora Molina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lizik, Dana)
July 9, 2020 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (dr)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
July 9, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr)
July 9, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7201825 re: # 3 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Aurora Molina (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Funk, Adam)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Aurora Molina by Adam T. Funk on behalf of: Dana Lizik JOHNSON LAW GROUP 2925 Richmond Ave., Ste. 1700Houston, Texas 77098 (713) 626-9336 Fax (713) 583-9460 dlizik@johnsonlawgroup.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Funk, Adam)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 9, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by AURORA MOLINA of Good Standing of Dana Lizik (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Funk, Adam)
July 8, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7201277 re #1 Complaint filed by AURORA MOLINA (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Funk, Adam)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by AURORA MOLINA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Funk, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURORA MOLINA
Represented By: Adam T. Funk
Represented By: Dana Lizik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Timothy C. Holm
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Represented By: Timothy C. Holm
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?