Speer v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Margaret Speer
Defendant: Lago Rico Inc, Robert Gagnon, Bureau of Reclamation, The, United States Department of Interior The, United States of America, New Mexico Muncipal League, Neal B Brown, United States Department of Interior, Bureau of Reclamation, Civil Process Clerk district of new mexico and New Mexico Municipal League, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00692
Filed: July 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lago Rico Inc (Steinman, Gregory)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 Lago Rico, Inc.'s ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint, by Lago Rico Inc.(Steinman, Gregory)
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Speer. United States Department of Interior served on 7/22/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Berlin, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Speer. Civil Process Clerk district of New Mexico served on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Berlin, Robert) Modified text on 8/13/2020 (cer).
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Speer. United States of America served on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Berlin, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Speer. Bureau of Reclamation served on 7/22/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Berlin, Robert)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Speer. Lago Rico Inc served on 7/26/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Berlin, Robert)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Speer. (Berlin, Robert) Modified text on 8/13/2020 (cer).
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Speer. (Berlin, Robert) Modified text on 8/13/2020 (cer).
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Speer. Civil Process Clerk district of new mexico served on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Berlin, Robert) Modified text on 8/13/2020 (cer).
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 **FILED IN ERROR** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret Speer. (Berlin, Robert) Modified text on 8/13/2020 (cer).
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory D. Steinman on behalf of Lago Rico Inc (Steinman, Gregory)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to New Mexico Municipal League, Inc. by Margaret Speer (Berlin, Robert)
July 27, 2020 Alias Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (arp)
July 16, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and U.S. Attorney. (arp)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lago Rico Inc, Robert Gagnon, Bureau of Reclamation, United States Department of Interior, United States of America, New Mexico Muncipal League. adding New Mexico Municipal League, Inc.. terminating Neal B Brown (registered agent) and New Mexico Muncipal League., filed by Margaret Speer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berlin, Robert)
July 14, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7209491 re #1 Complaint filed by Margaret Speer (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Berlin, Robert)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 14, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (arp)
July 14, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Margaret Speer. (Berlin, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speer v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lago Rico Inc
Represented By: Gregory D. Steinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gagnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Reclamation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Muncipal League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal B Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Reclamation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civil Process Clerk district of new mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Mexico Municipal League, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Speer
Represented By: Robert A. Berlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?