Lewis v. XL Catlin
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lewis
Defendant: XL Catlin
Case Number: 2:2020cv00705
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Judith C Herrera
2 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Settlement Conference set for March 9, 2021 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 480 Picacho Courtroom (South Tower). Telephonic Status Conference set for January 28, 2021 at 10:00 AM. Consult Order for associated deadlines. (atc)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Discovery due by February 28, 2021. Motions relating to discovery due by March 31, 2021. All other motions due by April 30, 2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by May 21, 2021. (atc)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING JOINT STATUS REPORT by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (atc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 22 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Scheduling Conference held on 8/27/2020. (atc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Wang on behalf of Jennifer Lewis (Wang, Sean)
August 18, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jennifer Lewis of Initial Disclosures (Wang, Sean) Modified text on 8/19/2020 (mjr).
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by XL Catlin Initial Disclosures (Pullen, Lisa)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 16. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
August 13, 2020 Filing 17 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by XL Catlin (Wesner, David)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for August 27, 2020 at 02:00 PM. Joint Status Report due by August 10, 2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than August 17, 2020. (cbf)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 Transmittal of State Court Documents by XL Catlin (Wesner, David)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Counterclaim) by Jennifer Lewis. Related document: #10 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim filed by XL Catlin.(Trenchard, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to Jennifer Lewis. (arp)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by David M Wesner (Wesner, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Jennifer Lewis against XL Catlin by XL Catlin. (Wesner, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by XL Catlin of Attorneys in Good Standing (Wesner, David)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant XL Catlin by David M Wesner on behalf of: Michael Topp Clyde & Co. 101 Second Stree, 25th FloorSan Francisco, CA 94105 4153659800 Fax 415-365-9801 Michael.Topp@clydeco.us (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Wesner, David)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant XL Catlin by David M Wesner on behalf of: Bruce Celebrezze Clyde & Co. 101 Second Stree, 25th FloorSan Francisco, CA 94105 (415) 365-9870 Bruce.Celebrezze@clydeco.us (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Wesner, David)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 17, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7215944 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by XL Catlin (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wesner, David)
July 17, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7215957 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by XL Catlin (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wesner, David)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by XL Catlin of Judge Assignment (Wesner, David)
July 16, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7212827 re #1 Notice of Removal, (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Wesner, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Greenwich Insurance Company of Rule 7.1 Dislosure Statement (Wesner, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Wesner on behalf of Greenwich Insurance Company (Wesner, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Wesner on behalf of Greenwich Insurance Company (Wesner, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greenwich Insurance Company from Fifth Judicial District Court, case number D-504-CV-2020-00392. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Greenwich Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B1, #4 Exhibit B2, #5 Exhibit B3, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wesner, David)
July 15, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (arp)
July 15, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. XL Catlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Catlin
Represented By: David M Wesner
Represented By: Lisa Entress Pullen
Represented By: Bruce Celebrezze
Represented By: Michael Topp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lewis
Represented By: Royce E Hoskins
Represented By: Sean Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?