Castro Zavala v. Chisholm Energy Operating, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eulalio Castro Zavala
Defendant: Chisholm Energy Operating, LLC, Defendant Contek Solutions, LLC, Chisholm Energy Management, LLC and Contek Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00738
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic hearing on #24 Defendant Contek's Motion for Extension of Time for September 23, 2020, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (am)
September 3, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #4 Notice of Removal, and Response to Motion to Remand by Contek Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Radcliff, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: Nos. 17 and 18. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
August 27, 2020 Filing 22 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 27, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Contek Solutions, LLC. (Radcliff, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand by Eulalio Castro Zavala. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Perdue, Ryan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eulalio Castro Zavala. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Perdue, Ryan)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2) and considering the pending motion to dismiss, the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (cbf)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING Defendant Contek Solutions, LLC leave to amend #4 the Notice of Removal no later than September 3, 2020. (jcm)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Chisholm Energy Operating, LLC of Consent to Removal (Harris, Josh)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Contek Solutions, LLC. (Banville, Kevin)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Contek Solutions, LLC. (Banville, Kevin)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Contek Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Environmental Resources Management Southwest Inc. for Contek Solutions, LLC. (Banville, Kevin)
July 30, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7233893 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Contek Solutions, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Laskey, H)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Contek Solutions, LLC of Association of Attorney Scott McFadin (Laskey, H)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Contek Solutions, LLC by H Brook Laskey on behalf of: Scott McFadin Weinstein Radcliff Pipkin LLP 8350 N. Central Expressway, Suite 1550Dallas, TX 75206 214-865-6979 smcfadin@weinrad.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Laskey, H)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Contek Solutions, LLC of Association of Attorney Robert Radcliff (Laskey, H)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Contek Solutions, LLC by H Brook Laskey on behalf of: Robert Radcliff Weinstein Radcliff Pipkin LLP 8350 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 1550Dallas, TX 75206 2138656136 rradcliff@weinrad.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Laskey, H)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Eulalio Castro Zavala re 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Joel C. Simon (Perdue, Ryan)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Eulalio Castro Zavala by Ryan M Perdue on behalf of: Joel C. Simon Fernelius Simon Mace Robertson Perdue PLLC 4119 Montrose Blvd., Suite 500Houston, Texas 77006 713-654-1200 Fax 713-654-4039 joel.simon@trialattorneytx.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Perdue, Ryan)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 29, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7232656 re: # 5 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Eulalio Castro Zavala (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Perdue, Ryan)
July 29, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7233225 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Contek Solutions, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Laskey, H)
July 27, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7227952 re #4 Notice of Removal, filed by Contek Solutions, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Laskey, H)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
July 24, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (arp)
July 24, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (arp)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by H Brook Laskey on behalf of Contek Solutions, LLC (Laskey, H)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE by Contek Solutions, LLC of Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Laskey, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro Zavala v. Chisholm Energy Operating, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chisholm Energy Operating, LLC
Represented By: Josh A. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant Contek Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Kevin J. Banville
Represented By: H Brook Laskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chisholm Energy Management, LLC
Represented By: Josh A. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contek Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Kevin J. Banville
Represented By: H Brook Laskey
Represented By: Scott McFadin
Represented By: Robert K. Radcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eulalio Castro Zavala
Represented By: Ryan M Perdue
Represented By: Rachel Mary Christine Ambler
Represented By: Stephen Fernelius
Represented By: Joel C. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?