United Financial Casualty Company v. Morales et al
Plaintiff: United Financial Casualty Company
Defendant: WPX Energy Permian, LLC, Todd M. Lopez, Yulma Fernandez-Renteria, Diana Morales doing business as Roberg Trucking, Maria Guadalupe Grado-Sanchez and Patrick Smith
Case Number: 2:2020cv00867
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Financial Casualty Company. WPX Energy Permian, LLC served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Allen, Meena)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Financial Casualty Company. Todd M. Lopez served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Allen, Meena)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Todd M. Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibi D) (Wallin, Dennis)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Todd M. Lopez. (Wallin, Dennis)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Defendant Patrick Smith's Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Patrick Smith. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by United Financial Casualty Company.(Inderman, Chad)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Inderman on behalf of Patrick Smith (Inderman, Chad)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Financial Casualty Company. Patrick Smith served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (Allen, Meena)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dr)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment Relief against Yulma Fernandez-Renteria, as Next Friend of Erick Adrian Avila-Fernandez, Dilan Steeven Avila-Fernandez and Yahir Eduardo Avila-Fernandez, minor children, Maria Guadalupe Grado-Sanchez, Todd M. Lopez, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Erick Eduardo Avila-Grado, Diana Morales d/b/a Roberg Trucking, Patrick Smith, WPX Energy Permian, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by United Financial Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Meena)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (arp)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7280753 re #1 Complaint,, filed by United Financial Casualty Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Allen, Meena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Financial Casualty Company v. Morales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WPX Energy Permian, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd M. Lopez
Represented By: Alisa C Lauer
Represented By: Dennis K. Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yulma Fernandez-Renteria
Represented By: Alisa C Lauer
Represented By: Dennis K. Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Morales doing business as Roberg Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Guadalupe Grado-Sanchez
Represented By: Alisa C Lauer
Represented By: Dennis K. Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Smith
Represented By: Chad Inderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Kerri Lee Allensworth
Represented By: Meena H Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?