Crouch v. Roberts Enterprises Investments, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gary Crouch
Defendant: REI Cattle Company, Robert Enterprises Investments, Inc. and Roberts Enterprises Investments, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00988
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 23 Remand Letter as to First Judicial District Court (nr)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #16 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. This action is REMANDED to the First Judicial District Court, Santa Fe County, State of New Mexico. The Clerk of Court is hereby DIRECTED to take the necessary actions to remand the case. Plaintiff's request for attorney fees is DENIED. (rcf)
November 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Gary Crouch re #16 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff filed by Gary Crouch (Kaufman, Justin)
November 23, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff filed by Gary Crouch. (Kaufman, Justin)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Vacate by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for November 19, 2020, is hereby vacated. Initial Scheduling Order #8 and all accompanying deadlines are also vacated. (ke)
November 13, 2020 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Vacate November 19, 2020 Rule 16B Scheduling Conference by Gary Crouch. (Kaufman, Justin)
November 9, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff filed by Robert Enterprises Investments, Inc. (McAlister, James) Modified on 11/9/2020 per call on Help Desk fixed to correct filer (meq).
October 26, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff by Gary Crouch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Kaufman, Justin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 13 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Robert Enterprises Investments, Inc., 14 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by REI Cattle Company, & 12 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Gary Crouch. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (rh)
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), REI Cattle Company voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Riley, Mark)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Robert Enterprises Investments, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (McAlister, James)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Gary Crouch voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Kaufman, Justin)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by October 20, 2020. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by REI Cattle Company (Riley, Mark)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by REI Cattle Company. (Riley, Mark)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 11/12/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 11/19/2020 at 2:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/20/2020. (ke)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Riley on behalf of REI Cattle Company (Riley, Mark)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by REI Cattle Company Consent for Removal (Riley, Mark)
September 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. McAlister on behalf of Robert Enterprises Investments, Inc. (McAlister, James)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by P. Scott Eaton on behalf of Robert Enterprises Investments, Inc. (Eaton, P.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 28, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
September 28, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Robert Enterprises Investments, Inc. (Eaton, P.) Modified text on 10/5/2020 (vh).
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by REI Cattle Company, Robert Enterprises Investments, Inc. from First Judicial District Court, case number d-101-cv-2020-01553. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by REI Cattle Company, Robert Enterprises Investments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eaton, P.)
September 25, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7328726 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by REI Cattle Company, Robert Enterprises Investments, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Eaton, P.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crouch v. Roberts Enterprises Investments, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REI Cattle Company
Represented By: P. Scott Eaton
Represented By: Drew Larkin
Represented By: Mark J. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Enterprises Investments, Inc.
Represented By: P. Scott Eaton
Represented By: James D. McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts Enterprises Investments, Inc.
Represented By: P. Scott Eaton
Represented By: James D. McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Crouch
Represented By: Rosalind Bienvenu
Represented By: Caren I Friedman
Represented By: Justin Ross Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?