Luevanos v. World Wide Technology, LLC
Plaintiff: Luz Maria Luevanos
Defendant: World Wide Technology, LLC and BG Staffing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00993
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Carmen E Garza
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Luz Maria Luevanos re #11 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court And For Attorney Fees filed by Luz Maria Luevanos (Elizondo, Lisa)
November 16, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court And For Attorney Fees filed by Luz Maria Luevanos. (Elizondo, Lisa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Higgins on behalf of World Wide Technology, LLC (Higgins, Nathaniel)
November 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 04/04/2022, through 04/07/2022, (approximately four (4) days), at 09:00 AM, in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 10, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 03/04/2022, at 08:30 AM, in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by using ATT Conference Number: 888-557-8511; and Access Code: 8270258. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing indicating your preference to appear telephonically). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 10, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 02/04/2022, at 08:30 AM, in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) - before Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Counsel may appear telephonically for all Pretrial Conferences by using ATT Conference Number: 888-557-8511; and Access Code: 8270258. Please call Judge Brack's Chambers two (2) weeks prior to your scheduled hearing indicating your preference to appear telephonically). (ao)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court And For Attorney Fees filed by World Wide Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Lamont, Charlotte)
November 6, 2020 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7395295 re: # 19 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by World Wide Technology, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lamont, Charlotte)
November 6, 2020 Filing 19 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant World Wide Technology, LLC by Charlotte A. Lamont on behalf of: Nathaniel Higgins Littler Mendelson, P.C. 1301 McKinney Street, Suite 1900Houston, Texas 77010 7139519400 Fax 7139519212 nhiggins@littler.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Lamont, Charlotte)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by World Wide Technology, LLC of Good Standing for Non-Member Attorney (Lamont, Charlotte)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 01/26/2021, at 1:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (crc)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Adopting Joint Status Report & Discovery Plan by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. (crc)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Discovery due by 5/3/2021. Pretrial motions due by 6/3/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due to the Court by 8/2/2021. (crc)
November 5, 2020 Filing 14 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza: Scheduling Conference held on 11/4/2020. (crc)
November 5, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by World Wide Technology, LLC Regarding Initial Disclosures (Lamont, Charlotte)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by World Wide Technology, LLC (Lamont, Charlotte)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court And For Attorney Fees by Luz Maria Luevanos. (Elizondo, Lisa)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 8. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 Defendants' Original ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Jury Demand by BG Staffing, Inc.. (Rollins, Derek)
October 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by BG Staffing, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Consent to Removal (Rollins, Derek)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by World Wide Technology, LLC (Lamont, Charlotte)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. A Joint Status Report is due by 10/28/2020. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 11/4/2020, at 1:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter the Access Code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/27/2020. (crc)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by World Wide Technology, LLC. (Lamont, Charlotte)
September 29, 2020 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7331840 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by World Wide Technology, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Lamont, Charlotte)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
September 29, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr)
September 29, 2020 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by World Wide Technology, LLC from Third Judicial District Court, case number D-307-CV-2020-01335. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by World Wide Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lamont, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luevanos v. World Wide Technology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Wide Technology, LLC
Represented By: Charlotte A. Lamont
Represented By: Nathaniel Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BG Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Derek Taylor Rollins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Maria Luevanos
Represented By: Lisa Anne Elizondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?