Nevarez-Ledezma v. USA
Petitioner: Jorge Nevarez-Ledezma
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 2:2020cv01144
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. The United States' Response to Petitioner's Motion due by January 18, 2021. (atc)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by USA. (Solis, Christopher)
December 29, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by USA. (Solis, Christopher) Modified on 12/30/2020 (bc).
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (atc)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E. Solis on behalf of USA (Solis, Christopher)
November 5, 2020 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Jorge Nevarez-Ledezma. (jjs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nevarez-Ledezma v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jorge Nevarez-Ledezma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Christopher E. Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?