Bryant v. Washington Federal Bank, Inc
Plaintiff: Ann W Easley Bryant
Defendant: Washington Federal Bank, Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01266
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR NOTICE AND WAIVER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. (am)
January 12, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack Dismissing Claim Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 1005 With Prejudice #6 Amended Complaint. (yc) Modified document type on 1/15/2021 (am).
January 12, 2021 United States Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack assigned. (dr)
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 REFUSAL TO CONSENT to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (cer)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Washington Federal Bank, Inc., filed by Ann W Easley Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons in a Civil Action)(cer)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and GRANTING leave to file an amended complaint no later than January 8, 2021. (rcf)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 review. (dr)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
December 7, 2020 Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (vh)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 CM/ECF PRO SE NOTIFICATION FORM by Ann W Easley Bryant (vh)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ann W Easley Bryant. (vh)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Washington Federal Bank, Inc, filed by Ann W Easley Bryant. (vh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Washington Federal Bank, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann W Easley Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Federal Bank, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?