Saiki v. People
Petitioner: Mark Saiki
Respondent: People
Case Number: 2:2021cv00070
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kenneth J Gonzales
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. (tah)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales denying as moot #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; and dismissing #1 Petition for 2241 Relief. (tah)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 Second Response to #3 Order to Show Cause, filed by Mark Saiki. (jjs)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #3 Order to Show Cause filed by Mark Saiki. (jjs)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 Mail sent to Mark Saiki Returned as Undeliverable re #3 Order to Show Cause. (jjs)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 Mail sent to Mark Saiki Returned as Undeliverable re #1 Petition for 2241 Relief. (Inmate looked up on BOP inmate locator website as well as DACDC inmate search site and was unable to be located) (jjs)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. Show Cause Response due by 3/5/2021. (tah)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Mark Saiki. (vh)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Mark Saiki. (vh)
January 27, 2021 United States District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales and United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saiki v. People
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Saiki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?