Taitt-Phillip v. Lockheed Martin Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Taitt-Phillip
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corp. and Lockheed Martin Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00150
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Kea W Riggs
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
2 Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (jls)
April 13, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement by Lockheed Martin Corp., Lockheed Martin Services, LLC. (Roberts, Bayard)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lockheed Martin Corp., Lockheed Martin Services, LLC Defendants' Initial Disclosures (Roberts, Bayard)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Lockheed Martin Corp., Lockheed Martin Services, LLC (Roberts, Bayard)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bl)
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Kea W. Riggs as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lockheed Martin Corp., Lockheed Martin Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent State Street Corporation for Lockheed Martin Corp., Lockheed Martin Services, LLC. (Roberts, Bayard)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2021. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 2:00 PM. Parties shall call Judge Wormuth's teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461, to be connected to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/23/2021. (ceo)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) to Recover Damages for Personal Injuries by Lockheed Martin Corp., Lockheed Martin Services, LLC. (Roberts, Bayard)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lockheed Martin Services, LLC, Lockheed Martin Corp. from Twelfth Judicial District Court, case number D-1215-CV-2021-00032. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Lockheed Martin Services, LLC, Lockheed Martin Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: State Court File)(Roberts, Bayard)
February 19, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7551932 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Lockheed Martin Services, LLC, Lockheed Martin Corp. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Roberts, Bayard)
February 19, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (dr)
February 19, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taitt-Phillip v. Lockheed Martin Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corp.
Represented By: Bayard Roberts
Represented By: Michelle A Hernandez
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Services, LLC
Represented By: Bayard Roberts
Represented By: Michelle A Hernandez
Represented By: Alex Cameron Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Taitt-Phillip
Represented By: John B Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?