Power Equipment Company v. Turner Brothers Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Power Equipment Company
Defendant: Jason Turner and Turner Brothers Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00153
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Carmen E Garza
2 Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 Plaintiff-Counter Defendant ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, for Breach of Implied Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing, Failed Contract/Unjust Enrichment, Negligence/Negligent Misrepresentation, Unfair Trade Practices Act Violations and Damages by Power Equipment Company.(Patton, Jason)
April 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 5. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
March 31, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 5/18/2021. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 5/25/2021, at 1:30 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] (crc)
March 30, 2021 Filing 6 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Power Equipment Company by Jason Turner, Turner Brothers Construction, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Power Equipment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2)(Domenici, Pete)
March 4, 2021 Summons Issued as to Jason Turner, Turner Brothers Construction, Inc. (arp)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 Filing Fee: $ 402, receipt number ALB049183 (snw)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Debt Collection and for Violations of the New Mexico Unfair Practices Act against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Deliver Payment), filed by POWER EQUIPMENT COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Patton, Jason)
February 22, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (dr)
February 22, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (dr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Equipment Company v. Turner Brothers Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Turner
Represented By: Pete Domenici, Jr.
Represented By: Reed C. Easterwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Brothers Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Pete Domenici, Jr.
Represented By: Reed C. Easterwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Power Equipment Company
Represented By: Jason J. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?