Khan v. Good News Jail & Prison Ministry
Plaintiff: Erik Khan
Defendant: Good News Jail & Prison Ministry
Case Number: 2:2021cv00289
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Laura Fashing
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number LC003750 re #3 Order (arn)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Enlargement of Time by Erik Khan. (gr)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Cure Defects by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Cure Defects by 4/30/2021. (cda)
March 30, 2021 United States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (ln)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Good News Jail & Prison Ministry, filed by Erik Khan. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(yc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Good News Jail & Prison Ministry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good News Jail & Prison Ministry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?