Teague v United States of America
Petitioner: Anthony David Teague
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv00400
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), #2 MOTION for Order filed by Anthony David Teague, (yc)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Selesia L. Winston on behalf of United States of America (Winston, Selesia)
April 30, 2021 Sr. United States District Judge Robert C. Brack and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED MOTION for Relief from Judgment Order by Anthony David Teague. (yc)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 SECOND MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Anthony David Teague. (yc) Modified on 4/29/2021 (jg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teague v United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony David Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Selesia L. Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?