Vendera Management III, LLC v. Chevron USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vendera Management III, LLC
Defendant: Chevron USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00419
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2801
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Vendera Management III, LLC (Cloutier, Andrew)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY ENTRY OF A SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Considering the pending motion seeking dispositive relief, the Court hereby finds good cause under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 to delay holding a scheduling conference and entering a scheduling order. The Court will set the case for scheduling once the presiding judge resolves the pending motion. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (atc)
June 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: In light of the pending #14 dispositive motion and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 6/28/2021 unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (nmh)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Chevron USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sutphin, Robert)
June 11, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Chevron USA, Inc. re 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District Certificate of Good Standing and Entry of Appearance for Margaret L. Wittenmyer (Sutphin, Robert)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Chevron USA, Inc. by Robert J Sutphin on behalf of: Margaret L. Wittenmyer Baker Botts LLP 910 Louisiana StreetHouston, TX 77002-4995 (713) 229-1234 Fax (713) 229-1522 margaret.wittenmyer@bakerbotts.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sutphin, Robert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Chevron USA, Inc. re Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District, 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Certificate of Good Standing and Entry of Appearance for Jason A. Newman (Sutphin, Robert)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Chevron USA, Inc. by Robert J Sutphin on behalf of: Jason A. Newman Baker Botts LLP 910 Louisiana StreetHouston, TX 77002-4995 (713) 229-1234 Fax (713) 229-1522 jason.newman@bakerbotts.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sutphin, Robert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Chevron USA, Inc. re 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, Association Dues for Attorney Licensed Outside the District Certificate of Good Standing and Entry of Appearance for Justin G. Lipe (Sutphin, Robert)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendant Chevron USA, Inc. by Robert J Sutphin on behalf of: Justin G. Lipe Baker Botts LLP 910 Louisiana StreetHouston, TX 77002-4995 (713) 229-1234 Fax (713) 229-1522 justin.lipe@bakerbotts.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Sutphin, Robert)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
June 11, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7736926 re: # 10 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Chevron USA, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sutphin, Robert)
June 11, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7736874 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Chevron USA, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sutphin, Robert)
June 11, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7736963 re: # 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Chevron USA, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Sutphin, Robert)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Chevron USA, Inc. answer due June 11, 2021. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (atc)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, 5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Chevron USA, Inc.. (Sutphin, Robert)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Chevron USA, Inc. answer due June 4, 2021. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENTS ARE ATTACHED.] (atc)
May 28, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Chevron USA, Inc.. (Sutphin, Robert)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vendera Management III, LLC. Chevron USA, Inc. served on 5/6/2021, answer due 5/27/2021. (Cloutier, Andrew)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Breach of Contract against Chevron USA, Inc. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Vendera Management III, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cloutier, Andrew)
May 4, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7674091 re #1 Complaint, filed by Vendera Management III, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Cloutier, Andrew)
May 4, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
May 4, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)
May 4, 2021 Summons Issued as to Chevron USA, Inc.. (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vendera Management III, LLC v. Chevron USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vendera Management III, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Cloutier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA, Inc.
Represented By: Jason A. Newman
Represented By: Margaret L. Wittenmyer
Represented By: Robert J Sutphin
Represented By: Adam G Rankin
Represented By: Justin G. Lipe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?