Custom Truck One Source, Inc. v. Bighorn Construction and Reclamation , LLC
Plaintiff: Custom Truck One Source, Inc. and Nesco Holding, Inc.
Defendant: Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC and BCR Companies
Case Number: 2:2021cv00545
Filed: June 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Carmen E Garza
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Custom Truck One Source, Inc..(Alonso, Gabriella)
July 9, 2021 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR: Defendant Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC. (Alonso, Gabriella) Modified to add error text per attorney request via CMECF help desk on 7/9/2021 (bc).
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Custom Truck One Source, Inc. (Nelson, Kevin)
June 16, 2021 Summons Issued as to Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC. (jg)
June 15, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7740715 re #1 Complaint filed by Custom Truck One Source, Inc. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Nelson, Kevin)
June 14, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
June 14, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)
June 14, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (jg)
June 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Custom Truck One Source, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 8)(Nelson, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Custom Truck One Source, Inc. v. Bighorn Construction and Reclamation , LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Custom Truck One Source, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nesco Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin P Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC
Represented By: Gabriella Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCR Companies
Represented By: Gabriella Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?