Teague v. USA
Petitioner: Anthony David Teague
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 2:2021cv00582
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Robert C Brack
Referring Judge: John F Robbenhaar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #3 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony David Teague. USCA Case Number 21-2081 (nr) Modified on 8/10/2021 (nr).[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack Denying #6 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (jjs)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Anthony David Teague. Related document: #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Anthony David Teague. (jjs)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 USCA Information Letter with Case Number 21-2081 for #3 Notice of Appeal filed by Anthony David Teague. (cer)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Transmission of Preliminary Record to US Court of Appeals re #3 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record, #2 Docket sheet) (cer)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order Dismissing Case by Anthony David Teague. (Appeal Fee Not Paid.) (yc)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack re: #1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (bc)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar assigned. (arp)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Anthony David Teague. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion) (yc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teague v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony David Teague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?