J&J Rentals, LLC v. Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC
Plaintiff: J&J Rentals, LLC
Defendant: Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00626
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC (Alonso, Gabriella)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), J&J Rentals, LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Cassels, Kelly)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as the trial judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by September 10, 2021. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, by Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B) (Alonso, Gabriella)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Joint Status Report is due by September 2, 2021. A telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for September 23, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. MDT. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than August 12, 2021. (rcf)
July 22, 2021 Filing 6 Clerk's Minutes for telephonic status conference held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar on July 22, 2021. (Recording Info: MARS) (rcf)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Mack Cassels on behalf of J&J Rentals, LLC (Cassels, Kelly)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for July 22, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. MDT. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (rcf)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Defendant Bighorn Construction and Reclamation, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC. (Alonso, Gabriella)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company from Fifth Judicial District Court in Lea County, case number D-506-CV-2021-00484. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Alonso, Gabriella)
July 8, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7777319 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Alonso, Gabriella)
July 8, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt and United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar assigned. (jg)
July 8, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Rentals, LLC v. Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Rentals, LLC
Represented By: Kelly Mack Cassels
Represented By: Noah Blaine Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bighorn Construction & Reclamation, LLC
Represented By: Gabriella Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?