Sandoval v. Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company
Plaintiff: Fabian Sandoval
Defendant: Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company, John Does and BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 2:2021cv00821
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: James O Browning
Referring Judge: Carmen E Garza
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BNSF Railway Company (Rodriguez, Justin)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 BNSF Railway Company's ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by BNSF Railway Company.(Rodriguez, Justin)
October 13, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Fabian Sandoval re #12 Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Fabian Sandoval (Grayson, Brian)
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Fabian Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Fabian Sandoval, #2 Exhibit Redacted State of Texas Identification Card, #3 Exhibit Redcated Social Security Benefit Statement, #4 Exhibit Change of Address with SSA, #5 Exhibit Redcated Medicaid Card) (Grayson, Brian)
September 20, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Personal Injury against All Defendants., filed by Fabian Sandoval. (Grayson, Brian)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza VACATING the Court's #7 Initial Scheduling order and VACATING the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 10/20/2021. (crc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge James O. Browning as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company of Filing Records and Proceedings of State Court Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings) (Rodriguez, Justin)
August 26, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. Joint Status Report is due by 10/13/2021. A Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 10/20/2021 at 10:30 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza. [Parties shall call Judge Garza's AT&T Teleconference line at (877) 810-9415, follow the prompts, and enter access code 7467959, to be connected to the proceedings.] Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 9/16/2021. (crc)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
August 25, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza assigned. (arp)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company (Rodriguez, Justin)
August 24, 2021 Filing 3 Defendant BNSF Railway Company's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) for Personal Injury by Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company. (Rodriguez, Justin)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin D Rodriguez on behalf of Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company (Rodriguez, Justin)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company from County of Eddy, Fifth Judicial District Court, case number D-503-CV-2021-00554. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - District Court Filings, #2 Exhibit B - CPD - Artesia Daily Press Staff, #3 Exhibit C - Bench Warrant, #4 Exhibit D - Plea - Agg Battery, #5 Exhibit E - Probation Discharge, #6 Exhibit F - DWI Plea, #7 Exhibit G - News Article, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, Justin)
August 24, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7856515 re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Rodriguez, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandoval v. Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Sandoval
Represented By: Brian G. Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company
Represented By: Justin D Rodriguez
Represented By: Owen Eugene Barcala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Owen Eugene Barcala
Represented By: Justin D Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?