Hartley v. Wallace et al
Plaintiff: Herbert Hartley
Defendant: Miles Wallace and Tutle and Tutle Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00866
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Stephan M Vidmar
Referring Judge: Gregory B Wormuth
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Herbert Hartley Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Balderrama, Celedonia)
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Tutle and Tutle Trucking, Inc. (Vazquez, Cindy)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Tutle and Tutle Trucking, Inc., Miles Wallace, & 6 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Herbert Hartley. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (rh)
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Tutle and Tutle Trucking, Inc., Miles Wallace voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Vazquez, Cindy)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Herbert Hartley voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Balderrama, Celedonia)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that this matter will be reassigned to a district judge as presiding judge if written consents from all parties have not been filed by October 6, 2021. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (rh)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. Joint Status Report due by October 21, 2021. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for November 4, 2021, at 02:00 PM by telephone. Parties shall call Judge Wormuths teleconference line at (877) 402-9753, access code 7578461 to be connected to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/6/2021. (emm)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Tutle and Tutle Trucking, Inc., Miles Wallace. (Moss, M.)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 3, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (jg)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Hartley v. Wallace, et al., case number D-503-CV-2021-00555. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Moss, M.)
September 2, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number CNMDC-7873482 re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Tutle and Tutle Trucking, Inc., Miles Wallace (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Moss, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartley v. Wallace et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Hartley
Represented By: Celedonia I Balderrama
Represented By: Frank V. Balderrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles Wallace
Represented By: M. Mitchell Moss
Represented By: Cindy M. Vazquez
Represented By: William J. Collins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tutle and Tutle Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: M. Mitchell Moss
Represented By: Cindy M. Vazquez
Represented By: William J. Collins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?