Schaap et al. v. Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools et al
Plaintiff: Art Schaap doing business as Native Pastures Dairy and Renee Schaap
Defendant: Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools also known as CROPP Cooperative doing business as Organic Valley, a Wisonsin Cooperative and CROPP Cooperative
Counter Claimant: Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools
Counter Defendant: Art Schaap
Case Number: 2:2021cv00883
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Mexico
Presiding Judge: Gregory J Fouratt
Referring Judge: Judith C Herrera
2 Judge: Kevin R Sweazea
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Art Schaap, Renee Schaap Initial Disclsures (Dunn, A.)
November 4, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools re: service on Plaintiffs' counsel of Defendant CROPP's initial disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) (Al, Marc)
October 29, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools re: Defendant CROPP Cooperatives First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Production of Documents, and First Set of Requests for Admission to Plaintiffs (served on October 29, 2021) (Al, Marc)
October 28, 2021 Filing 19 Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools (Al, Marc)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC RULE 16(c) HEARING by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The previously scheduled 17 Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing previously set for 11/4/2021 at 10:45 a.m. is hereby RESET to 11/9/2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. (nmh)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC RULE 16(C) HEARING by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The previously scheduled #10 Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing previsouly set for 11/4/2021 at 3:00 p.m. is hereby RESET to 11/4/2021 at 10:45 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. (nmh)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 16 Amended ANSWER to Complaint and Counterclaims by Art Schaap, Renee Schaap. Related document: #7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),,, Counterclaim,, filed by Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools.(Dunn, A.)
October 8, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),,, Counterclaim,, by Art Schaap, Renee Schaap.(Dunn, A.)
September 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 12. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
September 16, 2021 Filing 13 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp)
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Blair Dunn on behalf of Art Schaap, Renee Schaap (Dunn, A.)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2021 at 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 10/6/2021. (nmh)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),,, Counterclaim,, Exhibit K : June 28, 2021, internal email confirming Art Schaap's receipt of June 28, 2021 emails 1-5 by Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L : July 2, 2021 termination notice, #2 Exhibit M : August 9, 2021 final invoice email with statement and invoice, #3 Exhibit N : Art Schaap farm production by year, #4 Exhibit O : Wisconsin SOS certificate of good standing of CROPP Cooperative, #5 Exhibit P : January 7, 2021 email with statement and invoice, #6 Exhibit Q : February 5, 2021 email with statement and invoice, #7 Exhibit R : March 5, 2021 email with statement and invoice, #8 Exhibit S : April 6, 2021 email with statement and invoice, #9 Exhibit T : May 7, 2021 email with statement and invoice, #10 Exhibit U : June 9, 2021 email with statement and invoice, #11 Exhibit V : June 16, 2021 email regarding interest expense with interest rate schedule) (Al, Marc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal),,, Counterclaim,, Exhibit J : June 28, 2021 email 6 with link to PowerPoint and copy of PowerPoint by Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools (Al, Marc)
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against Art Schaap by Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A : CROPP Bylaws, #2 Exhibit B : certified copy of operative CROPP Articles of Incorporation, #3 Exhibit C : CROPP Dairy Pool Policy Manual, #4 Exhibit D : May 28, 2021 email exchange with Dairy Farmers of America, #5 Exhibit E : June 28, 2021 email 1, #6 Exhibit F : June 28, 2021 email 2, #7 Exhibit G : June 28, 2021 email 3, #8 Exhibit H : June 28, 2021 email 4, #9 Exhibit I : June 28, 2021 email 5) (Al, Marc)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools (Crown, Ross)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R Prowant on behalf of Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools (Prowant, Bradley)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools (Crown, Ross)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc A. Al on behalf of Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools (Al, Marc)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools from Ninth Judicial District, case number D-911-CV-2021-00111. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crown, Ross)
September 8, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7880366 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Crown, Ross)
September 8, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg)
September 8, 2021 Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaap et al. v. Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools also known as CROPP Cooperative doing business as Organic Valley, a Wisonsin Cooperative
Represented By: Ross L Crown
Represented By: Bradley R Prowant
Represented By: Marc A. Al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROPP Cooperative
Represented By: Ross L Crown
Represented By: Bradley R Prowant
Represented By: Marc A. Al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Art Schaap doing business as Native Pastures Dairy
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Jared Robert Vander Dussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Schaap
Represented By: A. Blair Dunn
Represented By: Jared Robert Vander Dussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Cooperative Regions of Organic Producer Pools
Represented By: Bradley R Prowant
Represented By: Marc A. Al
Represented By: Ross L Crown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Art Schaap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?